U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12023
  • Case Name: Frank E. Cain
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Intent]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Notice of Post/No-Post Petition Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order to Update]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Convert Case to 7]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Response]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order to Update]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.