U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kevin Mercado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • April 14, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.