U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-30409
  • Case Name: Scott Haselkorn and Megan Haselkorn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion for Approval]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Approve]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Amend]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amend]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.