U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10976
  • Case Name: Suzanne Eser
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Status Report]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion to Waive]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Transmittal of Addendum]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Appellee Designation]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Extend Time]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [** Not Used ** Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Amended Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Issues]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Appellant Designation]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Certification of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.