U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Amy Winslow, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • May 02, 2025: [Bifurcate]
  • May 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 08, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 17, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 14, 2025: [Travel]
  • March 12, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • March 09, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2025
  • January 21, 2025: [Reply to Response]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice - Other]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Amend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.