U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reardon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice Resetting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Revoke]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 08, 2024: [Excludable Delay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.