U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Reply to Response]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appendix/Exhibit]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appendix/Exhibit]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • March 14, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.