U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frank Castro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • March 20, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Letter- non-motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.