U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 23, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Abbreviated Electronic Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice Resetting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 22, 2025: [Letter- non-motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Excludable Delay]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum & Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Docket sheet sent]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 07, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.