U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10056
  • Case Name: Christopher P.C. Manchuk
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Opposition]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Assignment of Claims]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Compliance/Non Compliance]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.