U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10293-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CLS Global FZC LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order For Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 09, 2024: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.