U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10116-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Pyrtle et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • April 10, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response - unrelated to a motion]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.