U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunter et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff]
  • May 06, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 06, 2025: [In Limine]
  • May 05, 2025: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • May 01, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Rule 11 Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reconsideration]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Government Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.