U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10120-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Chase et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Government Attorney]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 25, 2025: [Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 10, 2024: [Suppress]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.