U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-30554
  • Case Name: White Violet Property, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear Telephonically/Video Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order To Set Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw As Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order to Update]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.