U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12053
  • Case Name: Robert J. Mann
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Withdrawal of Document]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [MDOR/IRS Withdrawal of Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Response]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Response]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Signature Page]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Signature Page]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.