U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Isidor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 09, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transcripts at government expense]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum - not related to a motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum - not related to a motion]
October, 2024
  • October 27, 2024: [Reply to Response]
  • October 23, 2024: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • October 16, 2024: [In Limine]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.