U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10321-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gesumaria
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 16, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 04, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2024
  • October 21, 2024: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.