U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-41064
  • Case Name: K & M Amusement Center, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Order on Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Notice]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Order To Set Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Response]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Extend Time]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Response]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Small Business Monthly Operating Report]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Convert Case to 7]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Supplemental Document]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Supplemental Document]
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Objection]
December, 2024
  • December 26, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 24, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.