U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patel et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Report]
November, 2024
  • November 18, 2024: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.