U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12330
  • Case Name: SGZ Group, Inc., d/b/a Kendall Press
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance/Representation]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Supplemental Document]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Affidavit]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Certificate of Vote]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Supplemental Document]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Objection]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Amended Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
November, 2024
  • November 20, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Tax Documents]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.