U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12358
  • Case Name: Debora J. Dyer and Dale C. Dyer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice of Post/No-Post Petition Creditors]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Intent]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order (Generic)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order (Generic)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Convert Case to 7]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Supplemental Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amend]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
November, 2024
  • November 25, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.