U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-30395
  • Case Name: Melinah Lovin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Request]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
February, 2025
  • February 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response]
January, 2025
  • January 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
December, 2024
  • December 02, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.