U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12444
  • Case Name: Jayaswal LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Application for Compensation]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Amended Motion/Application]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appear Telephonically/Video Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw Document]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Supplemental Document]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
February, 2025
  • February 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • February 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
December, 2024
  • December 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.