U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40096
  • Case Name: Stephen Moschella and Gilda Rossi
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Amend]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Extend Time]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Avoid Lien]
February, 2025
  • February 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.