U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10389
  • Case Name: Kerri A Robito
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Financial Management Course]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Amend]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.