U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40187
  • Case Name: Mortgage Unity, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Objection to Claim]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Opposition]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Termination or Absence of Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Amend]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury - Form 202]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order (Generic)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Amend]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Employ]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Supplemental Document]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Scheduling Order(Only Use for Subchapter V cases)]
  • March 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Application to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.