U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40223
  • Case Name: Vanessa Louise Stanley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Exhibit]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Objection]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Statement of Intent]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion To Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion To Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.