U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40031
  • Case Name: Jennifer Wilson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Objection]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Response]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Objection]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Opposition]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Request for Telephonic Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [2004 Examination]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Extend Time]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Affidavit]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Notice]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Amend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.