U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10475
  • Case Name: Roger R. Piffer and Deborah A. Piffer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion To Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion To Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order to Update]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.