U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10473
  • Case Name: Crystle M. Salamone
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice of Abandonment]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Objection]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Opposition]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Stay]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Employ]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Intent]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Employ]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Extend Time]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Signature Page]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order to Update]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.