U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10466
  • Case Name: Didie C Watsop and Hortance Watsop
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amend]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Extend Time]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Extend Time]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Response]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Objection]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Asset Notice Report]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Opposition]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Employ]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Extend Time]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amend]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amend]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Signature Page]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amended Voluntary Petition]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Amend]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.