U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12587
  • Case Name: Kwench Juice Franchising, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Small Business Monthly Operating Report]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Application to Employ]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Employ]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Employ]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Small Business Monthly Operating Report]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Employ]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.