U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-04005
  • Case Name: Soules et al v. Cormier et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Statement]
  • May 09, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Supplemental Document]
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Brief Memorandum (in Opposition to or Support of)]
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Request]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]
  • March 12, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.