U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10244
  • Case Name: Fritz F. Gabriel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [MDOR/IRS Withdrawal of Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion To Sell]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Status Report]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Supplemental Document]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion To Sell]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order To Set Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Sale]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Employ]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Schedules (Original)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.