U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10340
  • Case Name: Pedro S. Alarcon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Objection]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Appear Telephonically/Video Conference]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Supplemental Document]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Application to Employ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Employ]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order (Generic)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Employ]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Amend]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Asset Notice Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.