U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Noel Haro et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 15, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 11, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.