U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cazares et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Rule 11 Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.