U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10186-7
  • Case Name: USA v. Lyons, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Exhibit]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appeal of MJ Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Rule 11 Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.