U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-40024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Report and Order on Final Status Conference by MJ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • May 01, 2025: [Report and Order on Final Status Conference by MJ]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Canceling Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.