U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-06124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ojeda-Ruiz
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Transcript at Government Expense]
  • March 19, 2025: [Transcripts at government expense]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 11, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • March 11, 2025: [Complaint - Sealed]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • March 11, 2025: [Seal Case]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.