U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-01077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reis De Souza, et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Government Attorney]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • March 11, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender Program.]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.