U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10058-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Paula-Cabral et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice Resetting Hearing on Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Report and Order on Initial Status Conference by MJ]
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Other]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Objection - unrelated to a motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • April 15, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Letter- non-motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 20, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 16, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.