U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10251-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Muhammad
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order For Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.