U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10225-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jean-Baptiste
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 25, 2025: [Exclude]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice Resetting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Suppress]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Government Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.