U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10446
  • Case Name: CWB Realty
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Amended Document]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Small Business Monthly Operating Report]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Amended Motion/Application]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Cash Collateral]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Small Business Monthly Operating Report]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Supplemental Document]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Employ]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Extend Time]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Tax Documents]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Cash Flow Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Vote]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.