U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-12269
  • Case Name: The Good Guys Provision Co. Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Employ]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion for Approval]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Approve]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Equity Security Holders]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Schedules (Original)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury - Form 202]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Extend Time]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Employ]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Extend Time]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Extend Time]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Extend Time]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.