U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10137
  • Case Name: Nerline S. Laurore
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order Discharging Trustee/Closing Case]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order Discharging Debtor Ch. 7]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order (Generic)]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Amend]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Response]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.