U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-07070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AGUASVIVAS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • March 27, 2025: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 13, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.