U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10064-7
  • Case Name: USA v. Abreu, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 24, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Rule 11 Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 31, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.